OK HB2053 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-03-14 - First Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Public health and safety; confidentially of vital records; effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public health and safety; confidentially of vital records; effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 25) [PASS]
2019-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-14SenateFirst Reading
2019-03-14HouseEngrossed, signed, to Senate
2019-03-13HouseReferred for engrossment
2019-03-13HouseThird Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 2
2019-03-13HouseAmended
2019-03-13HouseHouse Rule suspended
2019-03-13HouseAuthored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author)
2019-03-13HouseGeneral Order
2019-02-28HouseRemove Representative Sanders as principal House author and substitute with Representative Sims
2019-02-28HouseCR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee
2019-02-06HouseSecond Reading referred to Rules
2019-02-04HouseAuthored by Representative Sanders
2019-02-04HouseFirst Reading

Oklahoma State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback