OK HB2041 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB2041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 18-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 15 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax credit for individuals; prescribing method for computation of tax credit; computation of taxable income; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; providing income tax credit for individuals; prescribing method for computation of tax credit; computation of taxable income; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Charles McCall [R] | Sen. Julie Daniels [R] | Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Rep. Terry O'Donnell [R] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] |
Rep. Mike Osburn [R] | Rep. Dean Davis [R] | Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Rep. Thomas Marti [R] | Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Rep. Chris Sneed [R] | Rep. Steve Bashore [R] |
Rep. Eddy Dempsey [R] | Rep. Dick Lowe [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 91 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-11 - House - House: TABLE AMENDMENT (Y: 63 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-15 | Senate | coauthored by Dills |
2021-03-15 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-15 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-11 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-11 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 91 Nays: 5 |
2021-03-11 | House | Authored by Senator Daniels (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-11 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lowe (Dick), Davis, Osburn, Marti, McDugle, Sneed, Dempsey, Sims, ODonnell, Bashore, Russ, Williams, Hill |
2021-03-11 | House | General Order |
2021-03-08 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Wallace, Echols |
2021-03-08 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2021-02-24 | House | Referred to Rules |
2021-02-24 | House | Withdrawn from Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-23 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-23 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2041 (Carry Over) 2021-03-17 - Second Reading referred to Finance Committee then to Appropriations Committee