OK HB2018 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB2018
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Ranson
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Ranson
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing eligibility for child of certified teacher to participate in program; effective date.
Title
Schools; Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; providing eligibility for child of certified teacher to participate in program; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Monroe Nichols [D] | Rep. Jon Echols [R] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] | Rep. Trish Ranson [D] |
Sen. Kevin Matthews [D] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-26 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-27 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Ranson |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and Career Tech Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and Career Tech |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Nichols, Echols |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB2018 (Carry Over) 2019-02-27 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Provenzano, Ranson