OK HB2001 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-09 - Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 50
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying amount of deduction from rent for repairs; effective date.
Title
Landlord and tenant; Oklahoma Residential Landlord and Tenant Act; modifying amount of deduction from rent for repairs; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-09 - House - House: RECONSIDER (Y: 62 N: 32 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 48 N: 48 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 17 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-09 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 50 | |
2011-03-09 | Title stricken | |
2011-03-09 | Amended | |
2011-03-09 | Returned to General Order | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 62 Nays: 32 | |
2011-03-07 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Dorman | |
2011-03-07 | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 48 Nays: 48 | |
2011-03-07 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Shelton | |
2011-03-07 | General Order | |
2011-02-22 | Authored by Senator Halligan (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-22 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |