OK HB1998 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 9 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-09 - Approved by Governor 05/06/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Revenue and taxation; creating the Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Services, Volunteer Fire Departments and Oklahoma Lupus revolving funds ; effective date.
Title
Revenue and taxation; creating the Domestic Violence and Sexual Assault Services, Volunteer Fire Departments and Oklahoma Lupus revolving funds ; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-27 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 67 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Subcommittee on Revenue & Taxation: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-09 | Approved by Governor 05/06/2011 | |
2011-05-02 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-02 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-27 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-27 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-27 | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-27 | Title restored | |
2011-04-27 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-27 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-07 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-07 | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Finance | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 67 Nays: 11 | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Shortey (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Dorman | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
68 | 2368 | 17 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 21 | New Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 22 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
68 | 2368 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |