OK HB1992 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1992
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - coauthored by Provenzano
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-05-18 - coauthored by Provenzano
Pending: Senate General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Jadine Nollan [R] | Sen. Darrell Weaver [R] | Rep. Monroe Nichols [D] | Rep. Melissa Provenzano [D] |
Rep. Lonnie Sims [R] | Sen. Tom Dugger [R] | Sen. Dave Rader [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-02-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 76 N: 20 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-18 | Senate | coauthored by Provenzano |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bullard |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Rader |
2020-05-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Dugger |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2020-02-17 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-02-17 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-02-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-02-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 76 Nays: 20 |
2020-02-13 | House | Amended |
2020-02-13 | House | Authored by Senator Weaver (principal Senate author) |
2020-02-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sims, Nichols |
2020-02-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee