OK HB1992 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1992
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Title
Cities and towns; creating the Oklahoma Public Safety Protection District Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-20 - House - House: County and Municipal Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to County and Municipal Government |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Nollan |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1992 (Carry Over) 2019-02-25 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute County and Municipal Government Committee