OK HB1992 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 16 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-12 - Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 30
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; sinking funds; surplus; transfers; repealer; effective date.
Title
Public finance; sinking funds; surplus; transfers; repealer; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 16 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 57 N: 40 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2011-03-03 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-12 | Measure failed: Ayes: 16 Nays: 30 | |
2011-04-12 | Title stricken | |
2011-04-12 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-12 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-05 | General Order, considered and deferred | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-22 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-03-16 | First Reading | |
2011-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 57 Nays: 40; Ayes: 48 Nays: 46 | |
2011-03-15 | Authored by Senator Crain (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-15 | General Order | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass Government Modernization Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Sullivan | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |