OK HB1987 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1987
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal procedure; authorizing defendants to file application for certain evidentiary hearing; time limitations; directing district courts to file decision within certain period of time.
Title
Criminal procedure; authorizing defendants to file application for certain evidentiary hearing; time limitations; directing district courts to file decision within certain period of time.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-21 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 79 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Judiciary |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 89 Nays: 2; Ayes: 79 Nays: 3 |
2017-03-21 | House | Authored by Senator Standridge (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-21 | House | General Order |
2017-03-01 | House | Emergency added |
2017-03-01 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1987 (Carry Over) 2017-03-27 - Second Reading referred to Judiciary