OK HB1952 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2012
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Motor vehicles; relating to governmental authority to weigh certain vehicles; clarifying authority of certain Corporation Commission employees; effective date; emergency.
Title
Motor vehicles; relating to governmental authority to weigh certain vehicles; clarifying authority of certain Corporation Commission employees; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Brecheen [R] | Rep. Jeffrey Hickman [R] | Sen. Bryce Marlatt [R] | Rep. Skye McNiel [R] |
Sen. Gary Stanislawski [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 78 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-04-24 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 74 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: Agriculture, Wildlife & Environment Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 15 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Approved by Governor 05/16/2012 | |
2012-05-10 | Sent to Governor | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2012-05-10 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2012-05-09 | Referred for enrollment | |
2012-05-09 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 78 Nays: 3 | |
2012-05-09 | SA's read, adopted | |
2012-04-25 | SA's received | |
2012-04-25 | Engrossed to House | |
2012-04-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-04-24 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 44 Nays: 0 | |
2012-04-24 | coauthored by Brecheen | |
2012-04-24 | Title restored | |
2012-04-24 | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute | |
2012-04-24 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2012-04-09 | Title stricken | |
2012-04-09 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-28 | Referred to Appropriations | |
2012-03-28 | coauthored by Marlatt | |
2012-03-28 | coauthored by Walker | |
2012-03-28 | Reported Do Pass Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2012-03-21 | Second Reading referred to Transportation Committee then to Appropriations Committee | |
2012-03-19 | First Reading | |
2012-03-19 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2012-03-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 74 Nays: 13 | |
2012-03-15 | Emergency added | |
2012-03-15 | Amended | |
2012-03-15 | Authored by Senator Stanislawski (principal Senate author) | |
2012-03-15 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hickman | |
2012-03-15 | General Order | |
2012-02-23 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2012-02-08 | Withdrawn from Calendar; rereferred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-03-02 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Agriculture, Wildlife and Environment | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative McNiel | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
47 | 1 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 1133 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 116 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 110 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 14 | 124 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 166 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 170 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 171 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 177 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 2 | 117 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 228 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 228 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 10 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 11 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 14 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 15 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 22 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 23 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 24 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 25 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 26 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 27 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 28 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 30 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 31 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 32 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 34a | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 34b | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 4 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 7 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 8 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 230 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |