OK HB1951 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1951
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State government; flexible benefit allowance; modifying allowance amounts; effective date.
Title
State government; flexible benefit allowance; modifying allowance amounts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 95 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Government Efficiency Committee: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-08 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Retirement and Insurance committee; CR filed |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Leewright |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Leewright; authored by Senator Quinn |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Retirement and Insurance Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-13 | House | Title stricken |
2019-03-13 | House | Amended |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Efficiency Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Efficiency |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Roberts (Dustin) |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1951 (Carry Over) 2019-04-08 - Referred to Appropriations