OK HB1949 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1949
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; local governments; bond issues; use of proceeds; publication; Internet access; effective date.
Title
Public finance; local governments; bond issues; use of proceeds; publication; Internet access; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Sen. Nathan Dahm [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-17 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 72 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - House - House: Government Modernization Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2017-03-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 72 Nays: 16 |
2017-03-22 | House | Authored by Senator Dahm (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-15 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1949 (Carry Over) 2017-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2017