OK HB1928 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/22/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Game and fish; modifying age restrictions for apprentice licenses; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; modifying age restrictions for apprentice licenses; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-16 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 41 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-18 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-06 - House - House: Agriculture and Wildlife: DO PASS (Y: 15 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/22/2013 |
2013-04-17 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-17 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-16 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-16 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 1 |
2013-04-16 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2013-03-12 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2013-02-19 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-02-19 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-02-18 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-02-18 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 0 |
2013-02-18 | House | Amended |
2013-02-18 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-18 | House | General Order |
2013-02-07 | House | CR; Do Pass Agriculture and Wildlife Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Agriculture and Wildlife |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative DeWitt |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |