OK HB1911 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; deleting certain knives from list of prohibited weapons; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; deleting certain knives from list of prohibited weapons; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Jordan [R] | Sen. Joseph Silk [R] | Rep. Mike Ritze [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-21 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-04 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 70 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Public Safety Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-28 | House | Approved by Governor 04/28/2015 |
2015-04-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-21 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-03-05 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-05 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-04 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-04 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 19 |
2015-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Silk (principal Senate author) |
2015-03-04 | House | General Order |
2015-02-23 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Ritze |
2015-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Jordan |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |