OK HB1911 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 24 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-24 - Approved by Governor 04/24/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Labor; modifying various provisions of the Employment Security Act of 1980; effective date.
Title
Labor; modifying various provisions of the Employment Security Act of 1980; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-17 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 33 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - House: Economic Development and Financial Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-24 | House | Approved by Governor 04/24/2013 |
2013-04-18 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-18 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2013-04-17 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 33 Nays: 9 |
2013-04-17 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Remove as author Senator Johnson (Rob); authored by Senator Newberry |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-13 | House | Amended |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Johnson (Rob) (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass Economic Development and Financial Services Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Economic Development and Financial Services |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Shannon |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 2 | 202 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 203 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 406 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 2 | 418 | New Code | See Bill Text |