OK HB1910 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1910
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-02-13 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee
Pending: House Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; creating the Education Act of 2023; effective date.
Title
Schools; creating the Education Act of 2023; effective date.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-08 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-08 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2023-02-06 | House | Remove Representative Fugate as principal House author and substitute with Representative Ranson |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Fugate |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1910 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee