OK HB1889 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-03-12 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Crimes and punishments; contributions to candidates; allowing certain political parties to be treated as separate entities; effective date.
Title
Crimes and punishments; contributions to candidates; allowing certain political parties to be treated as separate entities; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-02-27 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-12 | House | Laid over |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-27 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2013-02-27 | House | CR; Do Pass Rules Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Cockroft |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |