OK HB1888 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1888
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-03 - Laid over
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
State government; prohibiting certain entities from conducting gender or sexual diversity training or counseling; effective date.
Title
State government; prohibiting certain entities from conducting gender or sexual diversity training or counseling; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Danny Williams [R] | Sen. David Bullard [R] | Rep. Justin Humphrey [R] | Rep. Kevin West [R] |
Rep. Jim Olsen [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: TABLE (Y: 19 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 47) [FAIL]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-10 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-03 | House | Laid over |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading |
2021-03-03 | House | Ayes: 19 Nays: 35 |
2021-03-03 | House | Motion to table bill failed |
2021-03-03 | House | Amended by floor substitute |
2021-03-03 | House | Authored by Senator Bullard (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-03 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Olsen, West (Kevin), Humphrey |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Williams |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1888 (Carry Over) 2021-03-03 - Laid over