OK HB1885 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1885
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public buildings and public works; authorizing certain public trusts and public agencies to provide certain local bid preference of certain amount; effective date.
Title
Public buildings and public works; authorizing certain public trusts and public agencies to provide certain local bid preference of certain amount; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Chelsey Branham [D] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Kevin Wallace [R] | Rep. Avery Frix [R] |
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Sen. Micheal Bergstrom [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-09 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 81 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-28 - Senate - Senate: Committee On General Government: DO PASS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-07 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-27 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-16 | House | Approved by Governor 05/16/2019 |
2019-05-13 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-13 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-13 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-09 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-09 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 3 |
2019-05-09 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2019-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2019-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2019-04-23 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Bergstrom |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Reported Do Pass General Government committee; CR filed |
2019-03-25 | Senate | Second Reading referred to General Government |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Wallace |
2019-03-11 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-11 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-07 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-07 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 1 |
2019-03-07 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) West (Kevin) |
2019-03-07 | House | General Order |
2019-03-04 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Frix |
2019-03-04 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-18 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-18 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Branham |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1885 (Carry Over) 2019-05-16 - Approved by Governor 05/16/2019