OK HB1862 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1862
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 23 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-23 - CCR read
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Educational Television Authority; Executive Director; appointment criteria; compensation; emergency.
Title
Educational Television Authority; Executive Director; appointment criteria; compensation; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 58 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 43 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 69 N: 23 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 73 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 24 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 38; Ayes: 68 Nays: 23 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-19 | House | Emergency restored |
2017-05-19 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-19 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Smalley, Stanislawski, Sharp, Pemberton, Bergstrom, Dossett, Matthews |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming GCCA |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 1 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-02-23 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-22 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-22 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 73 Nays: 22; Ayes: 69 Nays: 23 |
2017-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Smalley (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-22 | House | General Order |
2017-02-14 | House | Emergency added |
2017-02-14 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1862 (Carry Over) 2017-05-23 - CCR read