OK HB1858 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1858
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Horse Racing Commission; funding; apportionments; revolving fund; effective date; emergency.
Title
Horse Racing Commission; funding; apportionments; revolving fund; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-01 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-26 | House | Approved by Governor 04/26/2017 |
2017-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-20 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-04-19 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Amendment restored bill to engrossed version |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Emergency clause restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Enacting clause restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Title restored |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Fields |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2017-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 93 Nays: 2 |
2017-03-13 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Bennett (John) |
2017-03-13 | House | General Order |
2017-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator David (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-02 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osborn (Leslie) |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1858 (Carry Over) 2017-04-26 - Approved by Governor 04/26/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
3A | 204 | 1A | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 204 | 1C | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 204 | 1D | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 204 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 205 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
3A | 205 | 6 | New Code | See Bill Text |