OK HB1857 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-21 - Approved by Governor 04/21/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Game and fish; modifying certain notice and permission requirements for fur dealers and trappers; authorizing use of certain type of trap; modifying posting requirements; effective date.
Title
Game and fish; modifying certain notice and permission requirements for fur dealers and trappers; authorizing use of certain type of trap; modifying posting requirements; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-02-19 - House - House: Wildlife Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Approved by Governor 04/21/2015 |
2015-04-16 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-04-16 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-16 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-04-15 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 46 Nays: 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2015-04-07 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Tourism and Wildlife committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Tourism and Wildlife |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-23 | House | Authored by Senator Boggs (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-23 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Wildlife Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Wildlife |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
29 | 4 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 501 | New Code | See Bill Text |
29 | 5 | 502 | New Code | See Bill Text |