OK HB1853 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1853
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma Local Development and Enterprise Zone Incentive Leverage Act; payments; tax credits; effective date.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma Local Development and Enterprise Zone Incentive Leverage Act; payments; tax credits; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House: Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-18 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2019-02-20 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-02-20 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-02-19 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-02-19 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 5 |
2019-02-19 | House | Authored by Senator Bice (principal Senate author) |
2019-02-19 | House | General Order |
2019-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass Banking, Financial Services and Pensions Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Banking, Financial Services and Pensions |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Fetgatter |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1853 (Carry Over) 2019-03-18 - Second Reading referred to Finance