OK HB1851 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-23 - CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; changing date by which full-day kindergarten is required to be offered by a school district; emergency.
Title
Schools; changing date by which full-day kindergarten is required to be offered by a school district; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Blackwell | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |