OK HB1833 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-22 - CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Uniform Commercial Code; modifications to Article 9; effective date.
Title
Uniform Commercial Code; modifications to Article 9; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-22 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2011-02-16 | Withdrawn from Rules Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Rules | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Trebilcock | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |