OK HB1826 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1826
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/10/2018
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Property; requiring covenant copies be provided; changing fee; effective date.
Title
Property; requiring covenant copies be provided; changing fee; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-02 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 39 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-25 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 58 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 24) [PASS]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 14 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-02-21 - House - House: Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-03 | House | Approved by Governor 05/10/2018 |
2018-05-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2018-05-03 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2018-05-03 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2018-05-02 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2018-05-02 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 39 Nays: 5 |
2018-05-02 | Senate | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-04-30 | Senate | 2 CCR read |
2018-04-30 | House | To Senate |
2018-04-30 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 21 |
2018-04-30 | House | 2 CCR adopted |
2018-04-26 | House | 2 CCR submitted |
2018-04-18 | Senate | SCs added Stanislawski |
2018-04-17 | Senate | SCs named Treat, Leewright, Bergstrom, Daniels, Pittman, Brooks |
2018-04-12 | House | Further conference granted, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary |
2018-04-12 | Senate | CCR rejected, further conference requested |
2017-05-25 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-25 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 58 Nays: 17 |
2017-05-25 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-24 | House | Title restored |
2017-05-24 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Treat, Newberry, Leewright, Scott, Silk, Sparks, Pittman |
2017-05-02 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 4 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-12 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business, Commerce and Tourism committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2017-03-01 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-01 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-02-28 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-02-28 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 14 |
2017-02-28 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cleveland |
2017-02-28 | House | General Order |
2017-02-21 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Civil and Environmental Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Civil and Environmental |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Kannady |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1826 (Carry Over) 2017-05-25 - CCR read