OK HB1826 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on April 28 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-28 - Approved by Governor 04/28/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring schools to adopt policies and procedures about school clubs and organizations. Effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring schools to adopt policies and procedures about school clubs and organizations. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Rob Johnson [R] | Rep. Sally Kern [R] | Rep. Daniel Sullivan [R] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: R (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: AMENDMENT (Y: 71 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2009-03-03 - House - House: R (Y: 86 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-28 | Approved by Governor 04/28/2009 | |
2009-04-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-22 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-04-21 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-04-21 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-04-21 | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 3 | |
2009-04-21 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-31 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-25 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2009-03-04 | First Reading | |
2009-03-04 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-03 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-03 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 18 | |
2009-03-03 | Amended | |
2009-03-03 | House Rule suspended | |
2009-03-03 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-03-03 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sullivan, Kern, Dorman | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Johnson | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |