OK HB1795 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1795
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 11-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 6 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-29 - SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Higher education; creating The Sergeant CJ Nelson Legacy Act; providing fee waiver for children of certain individuals; effective date.
Title
Higher education; creating The Sergeant CJ Nelson Legacy Act; providing fee waiver for children of certain individuals; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Appropriations: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-02 - Senate - Senate: Education: DO PASS (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-05 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2024-02-21 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED, STRIKE THE T ITLE (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-13 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-29 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2024-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Stephens |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2024-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 40 Nays: 0 |
2024-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Enacting clause stricken |
2024-04-18 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Treat |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Hicks |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Harris |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Coauthored by Representative Rosecrants |
2024-03-06 | Senate | First Reading |
2024-03-06 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2024-03-05 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2024-03-05 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2024-03-05 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roe |
2024-03-05 | House | General Order |
2024-02-22 | House | Title stricken |
2024-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Thompson (Kristen) (principal Senate author) |
2024-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) George, Stinson, Roberts, Miller, Duel |
2024-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, as amended, Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2023-02-22 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee |
2023-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2023-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Osburn |
2023-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1795 (Carry Over) 2023-02-22 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Education Subcommittee