OK HB1775 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Contracts; Unfair Sales Act; exemptions; effective date.
Title
Contracts; Unfair Sales Act; exemptions; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: Economic Development, Tourism: DO PASS (Y: 10 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Economic Development, Tourism and Financial Services | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Roberts (Sean) | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |