OK HB1771 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1771
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-30 - Title stricken
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; modifying qualifications for Governor's appointees to certain board; modifying number of board members appointed by certain entities; effective date.
Title
Public finance; modifying qualifications for Governor's appointees to certain board; modifying number of board members appointed by certain entities; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-30 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Finance: DO PASS AS AMENDED (Y: 10 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 81 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Technology Committee: DO PASS (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-30 | Senate | Title stricken |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Finance committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Finance |
2021-03-09 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-09 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-08 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 81 Nays: 9 |
2021-03-08 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2021-03-08 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass Technology Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Technology |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Dobrinski |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1771 (Carry Over) 2021-03-30 - Title stricken