OK HB1770 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 14 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-22 - CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Higher education; allowing certain vocational-technical courses to count toward certain Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program curricular requirements; effective date; emergency.
Title
Higher education; allowing certain vocational-technical courses to count toward certain Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program curricular requirements; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Schulz [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-12 - House - House: Higher Education and Career Tech Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-22 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2013-05-02 | House | HC's named: Conference Committee on Higher Education and CareerTech |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Conference granted, GCCA |
2013-04-30 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later |
2013-04-24 | House | SA's received |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2013-04-23 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-23 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Title stricken |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Education committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2013-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 94 Nays: 0 |
2013-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Schulz (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-13 | House | General Order |
2013-02-13 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Higher Education and CareerTech Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Higher Education and CareerTech |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |