OK HB1769 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-3)
Status: Passed on May 11 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating various highways and bridges. Emergency.
Title
Roads, bridges and ferries; designating various highways and bridges. Emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Dennis Bailey [D] | Rep. Samson Buck [D] | Sen. Johnnie Crutchfield [D] | Rep. Lee Denney [R] |
Rep. Joe Dorman [D] | Sen. Jerry Ellis [D] | Rep. Larry Glenn [D] | Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] |
Rep. Pat Ownbey [R] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Mike Shelton [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Joe Sweeden [D] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] | Rep. John Wright [R] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 92 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-02-24 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 97 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2009 | |
2009-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-04 | Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 6 | |
2009-05-04 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Sherrer | |
2009-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2009-04-15 | SA's received | |
2009-04-15 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-14 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-14 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 47 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-14 | coauthored by Ellis | |
2009-04-14 | General Order, Amended | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Bailey, Dorman, Ownbey, Walker | |
2009-04-02 | coauthored by Sweeden | |
2009-04-02 | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Transportation committee; CR filed | |
2009-04-02 | Pending coauthorship Senator(s) Sweeden | |
2009-04-01 | Reported Do Pass as amended Transportation committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-16 | Pending coauthorship Representative(s) Walker, Ownbey, Bailey, Dorman | |
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-25 | First Reading | |
2009-02-25 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-24 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-24 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 97 Nays: 2 | |
2009-02-24 | Amended by floor substitute | |
2009-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Glenn, Hilliard, Buck, Wright (John), Denney, Shelton | |
2009-02-24 | General Order | |
2009-02-12 | Authored by Senator Crutchfield (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-12 | CR; Do Pass Transportation Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Roan | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
69 | 1698 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 44 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 45 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 46 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 47 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 48 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 50 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 52 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 54 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 55 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
69 | 1698 | 56 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |