OK HB1767 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-22 - Approved by Governor 04/18/2013
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Title insurers; title insurance or certificate of title; modifying who is authorized to countersign certain policy; effective date.
Title
Title insurers; title insurance or certificate of title; modifying who is authorized to countersign certain policy; effective date.
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Newberry [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-04-10 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-12 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - House: Insurance Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-22 | House | Approved by Governor 04/18/2013 |
2013-04-15 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-15 | House | To Senate |
2013-04-11 | House | Enrolled, signed |
2013-04-10 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House |
2013-04-10 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2013-04-10 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Insurance committee; CR filed |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2013-03-13 | Senate | First Reading |
2013-03-13 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2013-03-12 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2013-03-12 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 4 |
2013-03-12 | House | Amended |
2013-03-12 | House | Authored by Senator Newberry (principal Senate author) |
2013-03-12 | House | General Order |
2013-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Insurance Committee |
2013-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Insurance |
2013-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative Russ |
2013-02-04 | House | First Reading |