OK HB1760 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-18 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee sub-committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Medicaid; creating the Commitment to Care for People with Complex Physical Disabilities Act; effective date.
Title
Medicaid; creating the Commitment to Care for People with Complex Physical Disabilities Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. John Enns [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-02-16 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee Committee Meeting: DO PASS (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-18 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee sub-committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Health Subcommittee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Enns |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
56 | 1012 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1012 | 2 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1012 | 3 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
56 | 1012 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |