OK HB1755 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/02/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-22 - Approved by Governor 06/02/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
State government; authorizing CompSource Oklahoma to develop a pilot program; exemption CompSource Oklahoma from compliance with certain laws and requirements; requiring CompSource Oklahoma to comply with certain procedures. Effective date.
Title
State government; authorizing CompSource Oklahoma to develop a pilot program; exemption CompSource Oklahoma from compliance with certain laws and requirements; requiring CompSource Oklahoma to comply with certain procedures. Effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-05-22 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 58 N: 34 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - House: CCR (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: C (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - House: (Y: 61 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2009-05-22 - House - House: CCR (Y: 65 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-03-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 51 N: 45 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: ADVANCE (Y: 54 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2009-03-02 - House - House: C (Y: 60 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-22 | Approved by Governor 06/02/2009 | |
2009-05-22 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-26 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-22 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-26 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 38 Nays: 9 | |
2009-05-26 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-22 | To Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 61 Nays: 38; Ayes: 58 Nays: 34 | |
2009-05-22 | Ayes: 65 Nays: 32 | |
2009-05-22 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-21 | Emergency added | |
2009-05-21 | Enacting clause restored | |
2009-05-21 | Title restored | |
2009-05-21 | CCR submitted, GCCA | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to GCCA | |
2009-05-13 | HC's removed: Martin (Scott), Moore, Watson, Sullivan, Dank, Dorman, Hilliard, Morgan | |
2009-05-12 | HC's named: Martin (Scott), Moore, Watson, Sullivan, Dank, Dorman, Hilliard, Morgan | |
2009-05-06 | Conference granted, SCs named Jolley, Lamb, Halligan, Crain, Easley | |
2009-04-30 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-27 | SA's received | |
2009-04-27 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-23 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-23 | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 2 | |
2009-04-23 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-30 | Enacting clause stricken | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-18 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-03-16 | First Reading | |
2009-03-16 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-12 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-12 | Motion expired | |
2009-03-11 | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2009-03-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 51 Nays: 45 | |
2009-03-11 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-11 | Amended | |
2009-03-11 | Considered | |
2009-03-02 | Laid over | |
2009-03-02 | Placed on Third Reading | |
2009-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Pittman, Derby | |
2009-03-02 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Emergency removed | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Jolley (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Government Modernization Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Government Modernization | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Martin (Scott) | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 129 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 207 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
61 | 60 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 65 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
62 | 41 | 29 | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5a | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5e | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5f | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 5j | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 41 | 7c | New Code | See Bill Text |
62 | 45 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3316 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3317 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3318 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3319 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3320 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3321 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3322 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3323 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3324 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 3601 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 3601 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 62 | 3 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 63 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 78a | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 78b | New Code | See Bill Text | |
74 | 840 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
74 | 85 | 3A | New Code | See Bill Text |