OK HB1752 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2015 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-26 - Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Labor; creating the Voluntary Veterans' Preference Employment Policy Act; effective date.
Title
Labor; creating the Voluntary Veterans' Preference Employment Policy Act; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-10 - House - House: Veterans and Military Affairs Committee Meeting: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-26 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business and Commerce |
2015-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2015-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Hoskin, Sherrer |
2015-03-02 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Simpson (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Veterans and Military Affairs Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Veterans and Military Affairs |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Newell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |