OK HB1748 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 9-1)
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 11 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-11 - Vetoed 05/11/2015
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; imposing requirements for disclosure of federal funds and analysis regarding reliance and costs for compliance; codification; effective date.
Title
Public finance; imposing requirements for disclosure of federal funds and analysis regarding reliance and costs for compliance; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Newell [R] | Sen. Greg Treat [R] | Rep. David Derby [R] | Rep. George Faught [R] |
Rep. Lewis Moore [R] | Sen. Kim David [R] | Rep. James Lockhart [D] | Sen. Kyle Loveless [R] |
Rep. Chad Caldwell [R] | Rep. Scooter Park [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-22 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 39 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-11 | House | Vetoed 05/11/2015 |
2015-05-05 | House | Sent to Governor |
2015-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2015-05-05 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2015-05-04 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2015-05-04 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Caldwell |
2015-05-04 | House | Motion expired |
2015-04-29 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Williams |
2015-04-29 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 69 Nays: 19 |
2015-04-29 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Faught, Moore, Derby |
2015-04-29 | House | SA's read, adopted |
2015-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2015-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 39 Nays: 1 |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Title restored |
2015-04-22 | Senate | General Order, Amended |
2015-04-06 | Senate | coauthored by David |
2015-04-01 | Senate | coauthored by Loveless |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Title stricken |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed |
2015-03-11 | Senate | coauthored by Park |
2015-03-05 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2015-02-26 | Senate | First Reading |
2015-02-26 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2015-02-25 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2015-02-25 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 70 Nays: 26 |
2015-02-25 | House | Considered |
2015-02-17 | House | Laid over |
2015-02-17 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2015-02-17 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lockhart |
2015-02-17 | House | General Order |
2015-02-11 | House | Authored by Senator Treat (principal Senate author) |
2015-02-11 | House | CR; Do Pass Government Oversight and Accountability Committee |
2015-02-03 | House | Second Reading referred to Government Oversight and Accountability |
2015-02-02 | House | Authored by Representative Newell |
2015-02-02 | House | First Reading |