OK HB1741 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1741
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Mental health; Mental Health Law; definition; effective date.
Title
Mental health; Mental Health Law; definition; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Sen. John Haste [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Public Health Committee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 80 Nays: 0 |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-24 | House | Authored by Senator Haste (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-24 | House | CR; Do Pass Public Health Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Public Health |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1741 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services