OK HB1739 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1739
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 2 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-14 - Referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Children; Connecting Futures Act; Department of Human Services; services; referrals; rules; Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; effective date.
Title
Children; Connecting Futures Act; Department of Human Services; services; referrals; rules; Oklahoma Higher Learning Access Program; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Sheila Dills [R] | Sen. Brenda Stanley [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] |
Rep. Marilyn Stark [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-02-14 - Senate - Senate: Committee On Health And Human Services: DO PASS AS AMENDED and referred to second committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 82 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - House: Children, Youth and Family Services Committee: DO PASS (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-14 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2022-02-14 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Health and Human Services committee; CR filed |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2021-03-02 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-02 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-01 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-01 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 82 Nays: 6 |
2021-03-01 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Stark, Hill |
2021-03-01 | House | General Order |
2021-02-09 | House | Authored by Senator Stanley (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-09 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Lawson |
2021-02-09 | House | CR; Do Pass Children, Youth and Family Services Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Children, Youth and Family Services |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative Dills |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1739 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Health and Human Services Committee then to Appropriations Committee