OK HB1710 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1710
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-16 - Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee
Pending: Senate Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
State Historical Preservation Office; transfer of duties to the Department of Commerce; providing for transferred employees to be unclassified; effective date; emergency.
Title
State Historical Preservation Office; transfer of duties to the Department of Commerce; providing for transferred employees to be unclassified; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Fetgatter [R] | Sen. James Leewright [R] | Rep. Mike Sanders [R] | Rep. Mark Lawson [R] |
Rep. Kevin McDugle [R] | Rep. Brian Hill [R] | Rep. Ross Ford [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 75 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-18 - House - House: Rules Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism Committee then to Appropriations Committee |
2020-03-03 | Senate | First Reading |
2020-03-03 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2020-03-02 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2020-03-02 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 75 Nays: 16 |
2020-03-02 | House | Title stricken |
2020-03-02 | House | Amended |
2020-03-02 | House | Authored by Senator Leewright (principal Senate author) |
2020-03-02 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) McDugle, Hill, Sanders, Ford, Lawson |
2020-03-02 | House | General Order |
2020-02-18 | House | Emergency added |
2020-02-18 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Fetgatter |
2020-02-18 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1710 (Carry Over) 2019-02-05 - Second Reading referred to Rules