OK HB1698 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 21 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-21 - Approved by Governor 05/21/2009
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing correctional facilities to serve free meals to correctional employees. Effective date.
Title
Prisons and reformatories; authorizing correctional facilities to serve free meals to correctional employees. Effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Billy [R] | Rep. Wes Hilliard [D] | Rep. Paul Roan [D] | Rep. Ben Sherrer [D] |
Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Randy Terrill [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2009-05-13 - House - House: (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2009-02-11 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-21 | Approved by Governor 05/21/2009 | |
2009-05-15 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2009-05-15 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2009-05-14 | Referred for enrollment | |
2009-05-14 | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-05-14 | CCR adopted, GCCA | |
2009-05-13 | CCR read, GCCA | |
2009-05-13 | To Senate | |
2009-05-13 | Measure passed: Ayes: 95 Nays: 2 | |
2009-05-13 | CCR adopted | |
2009-05-12 | Title restored | |
2009-05-12 | CCR submitted | |
2009-05-06 | HC's named: Billy, Denney, Hilliard, Roan, Coody, Rousselot, Hickman | |
2009-05-05 | Conference granted, GCCA | |
2009-04-28 | SA's rejected, conference requested, conferees to be named later | |
2009-04-16 | SA's received | |
2009-04-16 | Engrossed to House | |
2009-04-15 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-04-15 | Measure passed: Ayes: 41 Nays: 0 | |
2009-04-15 | General Order, Considered | |
2009-03-30 | Title stricken | |
2009-03-30 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; CR filed | |
2009-03-25 | Reported Do Pass as amended Appropriations committee; pending CR | |
2009-03-12 | Second Reading referred to Appropriations | |
2009-02-12 | First Reading | |
2009-02-12 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-02-11 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-02-11 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 98 Nays: 0 | |
2009-02-11 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Terrill, Roan, Sherrer, Walker, Hilliard | |
2009-02-11 | General Order | |
2009-02-05 | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-05 | CR; Do Pass Public Safety Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Public Safety | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Billy | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |