OK HB1692 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-11 - Approved by Governor 05/11/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Waters and water rights; relating to the Oklahoma Floodplain Management Act; modifying; emergency.
Title
Waters and water rights; relating to the Oklahoma Floodplain Management Act; modifying; emergency.
Sponsors
Sen. Eddie Fields [R] | Sen. Ron Justice [R] | Rep. Todd Russ [R] | Rep. Purcy Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-05-04 - House - House: EMERGENCY (Y: 48 N: 21 NV: 0 Abs: 32) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-05-04 - House - House: (Y: 84 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2011-04-18 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 77 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2011-03-02 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | Approved by Governor 05/11/2011 | |
2011-05-05 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-05-05 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-05-04 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-05-04 | Measure passed and Emergency failed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 0; Ayes: 48 Nays: 21 | |
2011-05-04 | SA's read, adopted | |
2011-04-19 | SA's received | |
2011-04-19 | Engrossed to House | |
2011-04-18 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-04-18 | Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-18 | General Order, Amended | |
2011-04-18 | Senate Rule suspended | |
2011-04-11 | coauthored by Fields | |
2011-04-11 | coauthored by Walker | |
2011-04-11 | Reported Do Pass as amended Energy committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-23 | Second Reading referred to Energy | |
2011-03-22 | First Reading | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-17 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-17 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 77 Nays: 1 | |
2011-03-17 | General Order | |
2011-03-07 | Removed from Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Placed on Consent Calendar | |
2011-03-03 | Emergency added | |
2011-03-03 | Authored by Senator Justice (principal Senate author) | |
2011-03-03 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute General Government Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Russ | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
82 | 1603 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1604 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1606 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1608 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1609 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1610 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1611 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1612 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1614 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1615 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1616 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1617 | New Code | See Bill Text | |
82 | 1620 | New Code | See Bill Text |