OK HB1686 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1686
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-16 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; excise tax on spirits and beer; revenue apportionment; sales tax exemption; effective date.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; excise tax on spirits and beer; revenue apportionment; sales tax exemption; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-15 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee: DO PASS (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-16 | House | Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Referred to Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1686 (Carry Over) 2017-02-16 - Recommendation to the full committee; Do Pass Appropriations and Budget Finance Subcommittee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
37A | 5 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37A | 5 | 104 | New Code | See Bill Text |