OK HB1684 | 2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1684
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 22 2017 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Schools; four-day school week; requiring school districts to submit plan to State Board of Education.
Title
Schools; four-day school week; requiring school districts to submit plan to State Board of Education.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-19 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 28 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 21 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-21 - House - House: RECONSIDER MEASURE (Y: 60 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 45 N: 43 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2017-03-14 - House - House: SUSPEND HOUSE RULES (Y: 21 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2017-02-27 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-15 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday |
2017-05-15 | House | CCR submitted; conferees unable to agree |
2017-05-08 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Fields, Stanislawski, Daniels, Brecheen, Pemberton, Pittman, Dossett |
2017-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Common Education |
2017-04-20 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-20 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-19 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 28 Nays: 13 |
2017-04-19 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Emergency clause stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Title stricken |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Emergency added |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Reported Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Education committee; CR filed |
2017-04-10 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Loveless |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Education |
2017-03-22 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-22 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-21 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-21 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 53 Nays: 38 |
2017-03-21 | House | Motion to reconsider adopted: Ayes: 60 Nays: 27 |
2017-03-14 | House | Notice served to reconsider vote by Representative Wright |
2017-03-14 | House | Third Reading, Measure failed: Ayes: 45 Nays: 43 |
2017-03-14 | House | Motion to suspend rule failed |
2017-03-14 | House | Authored by Senator Fields (principal Senate author) |
2017-03-14 | House | General Order |
2017-02-28 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Common Education Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Common Education |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1684 (Carry Over) 2017-05-15 - Coauthored by Representative(s) Cannaday