OK HB1680 | 2018 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1680
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on May 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Crime victims; directing notification of inmate release to designated service provider; time limitation for notice; Electronic Monitoring Program; changing agency responsible for certain notification; codification; effective date.
Title
Crime victims; directing notification of inmate release to designated service provider; time limitation for notice; Electronic Monitoring Program; changing agency responsible for certain notification; codification; effective date.
Sponsors
Rep. Harold Wright [R] | Sen. Anthony Sykes [R] | Rep. Scott Biggs [R] | Rep. John Jordan [R] |
Sen. Anastasia Pittman [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-25 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 43 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: POSTPONE TO A TIME CERTAIN (Y: 21 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-23 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: REJECT SENATE AMENDMENTS (Y: 61 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-05-03 - House - House: POSTPONE TO A TIME CERTAIN (Y: 21 N: 61 NV: 0 Abs: 16) [FAIL]
2017-04-26 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - House - House: Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-26 | House | Approved by Governor 06/06/2017 |
2017-05-26 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-05-26 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2017-05-26 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2017-05-25 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Coauthored by Senator Pittman |
2017-05-25 | Senate | Measure passed, to House: Ayes: 43 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-25 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2017-05-23 | Senate | CCR read |
2017-05-23 | House | To Senate |
2017-05-23 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 92 Nays: 0 |
2017-05-23 | House | CCR adopted |
2017-05-18 | House | CCR submitted |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Sykes, Fry, Griffin, Yen, McCortney, Dossett, Matthews |
2017-05-03 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-04-27 | House | SA's received |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2017-04-26 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 38 Nays: 0 |
2017-04-26 | Senate | General Order, Amended by Floor Substitute |
2017-04-06 | Senate | Reported Do Pass Public Safety committee; CR filed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Public Safety |
2017-03-07 | Senate | First Reading |
2017-03-07 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2017-03-06 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2017-03-06 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 0 |
2017-03-06 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Biggs |
2017-03-06 | House | General Order |
2017-02-22 | House | Authored by Senator Sykes (principal Senate author) |
2017-02-22 | House | Coauthored by Representative(s) Jordan |
2017-02-22 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections Committee |
2017-02-07 | House | Second Reading referred to Judiciary - Criminal Justice and Corrections |
2017-02-06 | House | Authored by Representative Wright |
2017-02-06 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1680 (Carry Over) 2017-05-26 - Approved by Governor 06/06/2017
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
21 | 142A | 13 | New Code | See Bill Text |
21 | 142A | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1071 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 360 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
57 | 510 | 9 | New Code | See Bill Text |