OK HB1680 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 3 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-03 - Approved by Governor 05/03/2011
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [Rich Text]
Summary
Schools; requiring school districts to report test results on high school transcripts; effective date.
Title
Schools; requiring school districts to report test results on high school transcripts; effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-04-26 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading (Y: 42 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-08 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 96 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-02-22 - House - House: Common Education Committee: DO PASS (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-03 | Approved by Governor 05/03/2011 | |
2011-04-27 | Sent to Governor | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-27 | Enrolled, signed, to Senate | |
2011-04-26 | Referred for enrollment | |
2011-04-26 | Engrossed measure signed, returned to House | |
2011-04-26 | Measure passed: Ayes: 42 Nays: 0 | |
2011-04-26 | coauthored by Fields | |
2011-04-26 | General Order, Considered | |
2011-03-29 | Reported Do Pass Education committee; CR filed | |
2011-03-15 | Second Reading referred to Education | |
2011-03-09 | First Reading | |
2011-03-09 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2011-03-08 | Referred for engrossment | |
2011-03-08 | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 96 Nays: 2 | |
2011-03-08 | General Order | |
2011-02-23 | Authored by Senator Burrage (principal Senate author) | |
2011-02-23 | CR; Do Pass Common Education Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to Common Education | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Quinn | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |