OK HB1665 | 2022 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1665
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 4 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations
Pending: Senate Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Public finance; Federal Funds Holding Account; General Revenue Fund; appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; Federal Funds Holding Account; General Revenue Fund; appropriations; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Kevin West [R] | Rep. Elise Hall [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-03 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 86 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House: Appropriations and Budget Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 20 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-15 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Appropriations |
2021-03-04 | Senate | First Reading |
2021-03-04 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2021-03-03 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2021-03-03 | House | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 86 Nays: 12 |
2021-03-03 | House | General Order |
2021-02-25 | House | Title stricken |
2021-02-25 | House | Authored by Senator Hall (principal Senate author) |
2021-02-25 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Appropriations and Budget Committee |
2021-02-02 | House | Second Reading referred to Appropriations and Budget |
2021-02-01 | House | Authored by Representative West (Kevin) |
2021-02-01 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1665 (Carry Over) 2021-03-15 - Second Reading referred to Appropriations