OK HB1650 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Status: Introduced on February 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-02-24 - CR; Do Pass General Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public finance; Oklahoma Program Performance Budgeting and Accountability Act; modifying submission of certain report by certain agencies; effective date; emergency.
Title
Public finance; Oklahoma Program Performance Budgeting and Accountability Act; modifying submission of certain report by certain agencies; effective date; emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-02-23 - House - House: General Government Committee: DO PASS (Y: 14 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-02-24 | CR; Do Pass General Government Committee | |
2011-02-08 | Second Reading referred to General Government | |
2011-02-07 | Authored by Representative Quinn, Nelson | |
2011-02-07 | First Reading |