OK HB1645 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending removal author Senator Ballenger and replace with Senator Anderson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-03-18 - Pending removal author Senator Ballenger and replace with Senator Anderson
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [Rich Text]
Summary
Public safety; providing conditions for release upon personal recognizance for certain violations; requiring disqualification of commercial motor vehicle driving privileges under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Title
Public safety; providing conditions for release upon personal recognizance for certain violations; requiring disqualification of commercial motor vehicle driving privileges under certain circumstances. Emergency.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2009-03-02 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 88 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2009-02-23 - House - House: Judiciary Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Pending removal author Senator Ballenger and replace with Senator Anderson | |
2009-03-17 | Second Reading referred to Transportation | |
2009-03-03 | First Reading | |
2009-03-03 | Engrossed, signed, to Senate | |
2009-03-02 | Referred for engrossment | |
2009-03-02 | Third Reading, Measure and Emergency passed: Ayes: 88 Nays: 8 | |
2009-03-02 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Roan | |
2009-03-02 | General Order | |
2009-02-24 | Emergency added | |
2009-02-24 | Authored by Senator Ballenger (principal Senate author) | |
2009-02-24 | Coauthored by Representative(s) Duncan | |
2009-02-24 | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Judiciary Committee | |
2009-02-03 | Second Reading referred to Judiciary | |
2009-02-02 | Authored by Representative Rousselot | |
2009-02-02 | First Reading |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
22 | 1115 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1115 | 2 | New Code | See Bill Text |
22 | 1115 | 5 | New Code | See Bill Text |
37 | 537 | 4 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 18 | 101 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 107 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 111 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 205 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 6 | 212 | New Code | See Bill Text |
47 | 754 | 1 | New Code | See Bill Text |