OK HB1640 | 2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB1640
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 23 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages; location of licensed establishments; authorizing certain waiver to prohibited location of licensed establishments; emergency.
Title
Alcoholic beverages; location of licensed establishments; authorizing certain waiver to prohibited location of licensed establishments; emergency.
Sponsors
Rep. Ryan Martinez [R] | Sen. Adam Pugh [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - Senate - Senate: FOURTH READING (Y: 35 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-21 - House - House: FOURTH READING (Y: 84 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2019-04-24 - Senate - Senate: THIRD READING (Y: 34 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-03-13 - House - House: THIRD READING (Y: 87 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-02-20 - House - House: Business and Commerce Committee: DO PASS AS AMENDED BY CS (Y: 14 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | House | Approved by Governor 05/28/2019 |
2019-05-22 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Enrolled measure signed, returned to House |
2019-05-22 | House | Enrolled, signed, to Senate |
2019-05-22 | House | Referred for enrollment |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Measure and Emergency passed, to House: Ayes: 35 Nays: 10 |
2019-05-22 | Senate | CCR adopted |
2019-05-21 | Senate | CCR read |
2019-05-21 | House | To Senate |
2019-05-21 | House | Fourth Reading, Measure and Emergency Passed: Ayes: 84 Nays: 9 |
2019-05-21 | House | CCR adopted |
2019-05-16 | House | Emergency added |
2019-05-16 | House | Title restored |
2019-05-16 | House | CCR submitted |
2019-05-07 | Senate | Conference granted, SCs named Pugh, Leewright, Bice, Stanislawski, Brooks, Young |
2019-05-01 | House | SA's rejected, conference requested, naming Conference Committee on Business and Commerce |
2019-04-25 | House | SA's received |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Engrossed to House |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Referred for engrossment |
2019-04-24 | Senate | Measure passed: Ayes: 34 Nays: 7 |
2019-04-24 | Senate | General Order, Considered |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Title stricken |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Reported Do Pass as amended Business and Commerce committee; CR filed |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Second Reading referred to Business, Commerce and Tourism |
2019-03-14 | Senate | First Reading |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed, signed, to Senate |
2019-03-13 | House | Referred for engrossment |
2019-03-13 | House | Third Reading, Measure passed: Ayes: 87 Nays: 13 |
2019-03-13 | House | Authored by Senator Pugh (principal Senate author) |
2019-03-13 | House | Remove Representative McCall as principal House author and substitute with Representative Martinez |
2019-03-13 | House | General Order |
2019-02-21 | House | CR; Do Pass, amended by committee substitute Business and Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to Business and Commerce |
2019-02-13 | House | Withdrawn from Rules Committee |
2019-02-05 | House | Second Reading referred to Rules |
2019-02-04 | House | Authored by Representative McCall |
2019-02-04 | House | First Reading |
Same As/Similar To
HB1640 (Carry Over) 2019-05-23 - Approved by Governor 05/28/2019